Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | By: Perry, Zaffirini S.B. No. 2660 | |
1 | + | By: Perry S.B. No. 2660 | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read | |
3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; | |
4 | + | April 10, 2025, rereferred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and | |
5 | + | Rural Affairs; April 15, 2025, reported favorably by the following | |
6 | + | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 15, 2025, sent to printer.) | |
7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
2 | 8 | ||
3 | 9 | ||
4 | 10 | ||
5 | 11 | ||
6 | 12 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
7 | 13 | AN ACT | |
8 | 14 | relating to the Hays Trinity Groundwater Conservation District; | |
9 | 15 | authorizing a fee. | |
10 | 16 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
11 | - | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 8843, Special District | |
12 | - | Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8843.102 to read as | |
13 | - | follows: | |
14 | - | Sec. 8843.102. PROHIBITION ON REQUIRING METERING OF CERTAIN | |
15 | - | WELLS. The district may not require a meter to be placed on a well: | |
16 | - | (1) used solely for domestic or agricultural purposes; | |
17 | - | and | |
18 | - | (2) drilled, completed, and equipped so that the well | |
19 | - | is not capable of producing more than 25,000 gallons of groundwater | |
20 | - | per day. | |
21 | - | SECTION 2. Section 8843.153, Special District Local Laws | |
17 | + | SECTION 1. Section 8843.153, Special District Local Laws | |
22 | 18 | Code, is amended to read as follows: | |
23 | 19 | Sec. 8843.153. TAXES [AND OTHER FEES] PROHIBITED. | |
24 | 20 | Notwithstanding Section 8843.101 or Subchapter G, Chapter 36, Water | |
25 | 21 | Code, the district may not[: | |
26 | 22 | [(1)] impose a tax[; or | |
27 | 23 | [(2) assess or collect any fees except as authorized | |
28 | 24 | by Section 8843.151 or 8843.152]. | |
29 | - | SECTION | |
25 | + | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 8843, Special District | |
30 | 26 | Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8843.1511 to read as | |
31 | 27 | follows: | |
32 | 28 | Sec. 8843.1511. PRODUCTION FEE. (a) The district may | |
33 | 29 | assess a production fee as provided by Section 36.205, Water Code. | |
34 | 30 | (b) A fee assessed under this section may not exceed the | |
35 | - | greater of 30 cents per 1,000 gallons of groundwater withdrawn. | |
31 | + | greater of: | |
32 | + | (1) 38 cents per 1,000 gallons of groundwater | |
33 | + | withdrawn; or | |
34 | + | (2) the raw surface water cost of other wholesale | |
35 | + | water suppliers providing water to customers in the district. | |
36 | 36 | (c) The district may use revenues generated by fees assessed | |
37 | 37 | under this section for any lawful purpose. | |
38 | 38 | (d) This section does not apply to: | |
39 | 39 | (1) a well used exclusively for an agricultural use, | |
40 | 40 | as defined by Section 36.001, Water Code; or | |
41 | - | (2) a well used exclusively for domestic use that is | |
42 | - | exempt from the requirement to obtain a permit under district | |
43 | - | rules. | |
44 | - | SECTION 4. The following provisions of Chapter 8843, | |
41 | + | (2) a well that is exempt under district rules. | |
42 | + | SECTION 3. The following provisions of Chapter 8843, | |
45 | 43 | Special District Local Laws Code, are repealed: | |
46 | 44 | (1) Section 8843.055; | |
47 | - | (2) Section 8843.103; | |
48 | - | (3) Section 8843.104; and | |
49 | - | (4) Section 8843.152. | |
50 | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
45 | + | (2) Section 8843.057; | |
46 | + | (3) Section 8843.103; | |
47 | + | (4) Section 8843.104; | |
48 | + | (5) Section 8843.105; | |
49 | + | (6) Section 8843.106; and | |
50 | + | (7) Section 8843.154. | |
51 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
51 | 52 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
52 | 53 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
53 | 54 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
54 | 55 | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. | |
56 | + | * * * * * |