House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2641 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1679 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 1668 |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |