Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2707 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2025

                    By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 2707
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain oversize or overweight vehicle permit fees or
 surety requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 622.134(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section [Subsection (a)] does not apply to a
 vehicle owned by a municipality or a county. The department by rule
 may exempt a vehicle owned by any other governmental entity from the
 application of this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 623, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 623.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 623.009.  WAIVER OF PERMIT FEE OR SURETY REQUIREMENT
 FOR GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES. The department by rule may waive the fee
 and any surety requirements, including a requirement for a bond or
 letter of credit, for a permit issued by the department under this
 subtitle to a governmental entity.
 SECTION 3.  Section 623.077(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An applicant for a permit under this subchapter, other
 than a permit under Section 623.071(c)(3) or (d), must also pay a
 highway maintenance fee in an amount determined according to the
 following table:
 Vehicle Weight in Pounds   Fee Vehicle Weight in Pounds Fee
Vehicle Weight in Pounds Fee
 80,001 to 120,000 $150 80,001 to 120,000 $150
80,001 to 120,000 $150
 120,001 to 160,000 $225 120,001 to 160,000 $225
120,001 to 160,000 $225
 160,001 to 200,000 $300 160,001 to 200,000 $300
160,001 to 200,000 $300
 200,001 and above $375 200,001 and above $375
200,001 and above $375
 SECTION 4.  Section 623.163(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section does not apply to a vehicle owned by a
 municipality. The department by rule may exempt a vehicle owned by
 any other governmental entity from the application of this section.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *



Vehicle Weight in Pounds Fee



80,001 to 120,000 $150



120,001 to 160,000 $225



160,001 to 200,000 $300



200,001 and above $375