Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |