Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |