1 | 1 | | By: Cook S.B. No. 2733 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 7 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 8 | | relating to the election of certain participating entities to |
---|
9 | 9 | | participate in the uniform group coverage program for active school |
---|
10 | 10 | | employees. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is |
---|
13 | 13 | | amended by adding Section 1579.1551 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 1579.1551. PARTICIPATING ENTITY PROGRAM |
---|
15 | 15 | | PARTICIPATION. (a) This section applies to a participating entity |
---|
16 | 16 | | that discontinued participation in the program effective on |
---|
17 | 17 | | September 1, 2022, in accordance with Section 1579.155(a). |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 1579.155(b), a participating |
---|
19 | 19 | | entity to which this section applies may elect to participate in the |
---|
20 | 20 | | program before the fifth anniversary of the effective date of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | participating entity's election to discontinue participation in |
---|
22 | 22 | | the program if the participating entity: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) provides written notice to the trustee not later |
---|
24 | 24 | | than December 31, 2025, of the participating entity 's election to |
---|
25 | 25 | | participate in the program effective beginning September 1, 2026; |
---|
26 | 26 | | and |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) complies with any other requirements established |
---|
28 | 28 | | by the trustee for program participation. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (c) For the plan year beginning September 1, 2026, the |
---|
30 | 30 | | trustee shall impose a risk stabilization fee in an amount |
---|
31 | 31 | | determined by the trustee on the premiums of a participating entity |
---|
32 | 32 | | to which this section applies. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (d) A participating entity that elects to participate in the |
---|
34 | 34 | | program in accordance with this section may not elect to |
---|
35 | 35 | | discontinue participation until September 1, 2031. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (e) The trustee by rule may impose additional requirements, |
---|
37 | 37 | | conditions, and deadlines with which a participating entity to |
---|
38 | 38 | | which this section applies must comply to elect to participate in |
---|
39 | 39 | | the program in accordance with this section. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (f) This section expires September 1, 2031. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|