Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2764 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/07/2025

                            By: Cook S.B. No. 2764
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 May 7, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2025, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2764 By:  Nichols




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided to a purchaser of a manufactured
 home regarding the ability to elect to treat the home as real
 property or personal property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1201.162, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Before the completion of a credit application or more
 than one day before entering into any agreement for a sale or
 exchange that will not be financed, the retailer must provide to the
 consumer a written disclosure in the form promulgated by the board.
 The disclosure shall be in at least 12-point type and must:
 (1)  address:
 (A)  matters of concern relating to costs and
 obligations that may be associated with home ownership;
 (B)  [,] matters to be considered in making
 financing decisions;
 (C)  [,] related costs that may arise when
 purchasing a manufactured home;
 (D)  a purchaser's ability to elect to treat a
 manufactured home as real property or personal property; [,] and
 (E)  any [such] other matters as the board may
 consider [deem] appropriate to promote informed purchase,
 financing, and related decisions regarding the acquisition and
 ownership of a manufactured home; and
 (2)  [.  The form shall also] conspicuously disclose
 the consumer's right of rescission.
 (d)  The disclosure required under Subsection (a)(1)(D) must
 explain:
 (1)  the conditions required under Section
 1201.2055(a) for an owner to elect to treat a manufactured home as
 real property;
 (2)  the effects of electing to treat a home as real
 property;
 (3)  that the election must be made on the application
 for the issuance of a statement of ownership; and
 (4)  that the election may be made to convert the home
 from personal property to real property or from real property to
 personal property.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1201.162, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to a disclosure that is provided to a
 consumer on or after the effective date of this Act. A disclosure
 provided to a consumer before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *