Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2786 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Creighton, Menéndez S.B. No. 2786
2- Parker
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
4+ April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 22, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2786 By: West
39
410
511
612
713 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
814 AN ACT
915 relating to the exemption from the assessment requirements of the
1016 Texas Success Initiative for certain students who are public
1117 officers or employees.
1218 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1319 SECTION 1. Section 51.332, Education Code, is amended to
1420 read as follows:
1521 Sec. 51.332. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter does not apply
1622 to:
1723 (1) a student who has graduated with an associate or
1824 baccalaureate degree from an institution of higher education;
1925 (2) a student who transfers to an institution of
2026 higher education from a private or independent institution of
2127 higher education or an accredited out-of-state institution of
2228 higher education and who has satisfactorily completed
2329 college-level coursework;
2430 (3) a student who is enrolled in a certificate program
2531 of one year or less at a public junior college, a public technical
2632 institute, or a public state college;
2733 (4) a student who is serving on active duty as a member
2834 of:
2935 (A) the armed forces of the United States; or
3036 (B) the Texas National Guard;
3137 (5) a student who is currently serving as and, for at
3238 least the three-year period preceding enrollment, has served as a
3339 member of a reserve component of the armed forces of the United
3440 States; [or]
3541 (6) a student who on or after August 1, 1990, was
3642 honorably discharged, retired, or released from:
3743 (A) active duty as a member of the armed forces of
3844 the United States or the Texas National Guard; or
3945 (B) service as a member of a reserve component of
4046 the armed forces of the United States;
4147 (7) a student who is:
4248 (A) certified as an emergency medical technician
4349 under Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code; and
4450 (B) employed by a political subdivision;
4551 (8) a student who is included as fire protection
4652 personnel by Section 419.021, Government Code; or
4753 (9) a student who is elected, appointed, or employed
4854 to serve as a peace officer described by Article 2A.001, Code of
4955 Criminal Procedure, or other law.
5056 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies
5157 beginning with the assessment of entering undergraduate students at
5258 public institutions of higher education for the 2025 fall semester.
5359 The assessment of an entering undergraduate student for an academic
5460 term before that semester is covered by the law in effect before the
5561 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
5662 that purpose.
5763 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5864 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5965 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6066 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6167 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
68+ * * * * *