Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB28 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Analysis February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 27, 2025
Bill February 27, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 25, 2025
Bill February 25, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2025