House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2646 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1504 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |