Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2807 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025
Fiscal Note March 14, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025