1 | 1 | | By: Hughes S.B. No. 2876 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 9, 2025, re-referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
5 | 5 | | April 22, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, |
---|
6 | 6 | | Nays 0; April 22, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
13 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
14 | 14 | | relating to increasing the criminal penalty for participating in a |
---|
15 | 15 | | riot while wearing a mask or other face covering. |
---|
16 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 42.02(f), Penal Code, is amended to read |
---|
18 | 18 | | as follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (f) An offense under this section is: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) an offense of the same classification as any |
---|
21 | 21 | | offense of a higher grade committed by anyone engaged in the riot if |
---|
22 | 22 | | the offense was: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (A) [(1)] in the furtherance of the purpose of |
---|
24 | 24 | | the assembly; or |
---|
25 | 25 | | (B) [(2)] an offense which should have been |
---|
26 | 26 | | anticipated as a result of the assembly; or |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) a Class A misdemeanor if it is shown on the trial |
---|
28 | 28 | | of the offense that at the time of the offense the actor was wearing |
---|
29 | 29 | | a mask or other face covering with the intent to conceal the actor's |
---|
30 | 30 | | identity. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
32 | 32 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
33 | 33 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
34 | 34 | | governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, |
---|
35 | 35 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
36 | 36 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
37 | 37 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred |
---|
38 | 38 | | before that date. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|
40 | 40 | | * * * * * |
---|