House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1584 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |