House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2642 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1681 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1681 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1681 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1592 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1592 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Point of order sustained | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Point of order | Journal Page: 1591 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Gutierrez | Journal Page: 1591 |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1591 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1404 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |