House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2462 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |