Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1671 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |