Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2972 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 2972
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2972 By:  Paxton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expressive activities at public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.9315(a)(2), (3), and (4), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Expressive activities" means any speech or
 expressive conduct protected by the First Amendment to the United
 States Constitution or by Section 8, Article I, Texas Constitution,
 and includes assemblies, protests, speeches, the distribution of
 written material, the carrying of signs, and the circulation of
 petitions. The term does not include:
 (A)  commercial speech;
 (B)  defamation;
 (C)  unlawful harassment;
 (D)  incitement to imminent unlawful activity;
 (E)  obscenity; or
 (F)  threats to engage in unlawful activity.
 (3)  "Governing board" and "institution ["Institution]
 of higher education" have [has] the meanings [meaning] assigned by
 Section 61.003.
 (4)  "Student organization" includes any organization
 that is composed [mostly] of students enrolled at an institution of
 higher education and that receives a benefit from the institution.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9315, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), and (f) and adding Subsections
 (d-1) and (k) to read as follows:
 (b)  It is the policy of this state and the purpose of this
 section to protect the expressive rights of persons guaranteed by
 the constitutions of the United States and of this state by:
 (1)  recognizing freedom of speech and assembly as
 central to the mission of institutions of higher education; and
 (2)  ensuring that students enrolled at and employees
 of an institution of higher education [all persons] may assemble
 peaceably on the campuses of the institution [institutions of
 higher education] for expressive activities, including to listen to
 or observe the expressive activities of others.
 (c)  An institution of higher education shall[:
 [(1)  ensure that the common outdoor areas of the
 institution's campus are deemed traditional public forums; and
 [(2)]  permit students enrolled at and employees of the
 institution [any person] to engage in expressive activities in the
 common outdoor [those] areas of the institution's campus freely, as
 long as the expressive activity [person's conduct]:
 (1) [(A)]  is not unlawful; and
 (2) [(B)]  does not materially and substantially
 disrupt the functioning of the institution.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an institution of
 higher education may adopt a policy that imposes reasonable
 restrictions on the time, place, and manner of expressive
 activities of students enrolled at and employees of the institution
 in the common outdoor areas of the institution's campus if those
 restrictions:
 (1)  are reasonable in light of the purpose of the area
 to which the restrictions apply [narrowly tailored to serve a
 significant institutional interest];
 (2)  employ clear, published, content-neutral, and
 viewpoint-neutral criteria;
 (3)  provide for ample alternative means of expression;
 and
 (4)  allow students enrolled at and employees of the
 institution [members of the university community] to assemble or
 distribute written material without a permit or other permission
 from the institution.
 (d-1)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education may designate the areas on the institution's campus that
 are public forums, consistent with the First Amendment to the
 United States Constitution and Section 8, Article I, Texas
 Constitution.
 (f)  Each institution of higher education shall adopt a
 policy detailing [students'] rights and responsibilities regarding
 expressive activities at the institution. The policy must:
 (1)  allow:
 (A)  students enrolled at and employees of the
 institution [any person] to, subject to reasonable restrictions
 adopted under Subsection (d), engage in expressive activities on
 campus, including by responding to the expressive activities of
 others; and
 (B)  student organizations and faculty to,
 subject to Subdivision (2)(B)(ii) and Subsection (h), invite
 speakers to speak on campus;
 (2)  prohibit:
 (A)  using a device to amplify sound while
 engaging in expressive activities on campus during class hours;
 (B)  during the last two weeks of a semester or
 term, engaging in expressive activities:
 (i)  in the common outdoor areas of the
 institution's campus in a manner that materially and substantially
 disrupts the functioning of the institution;
 (ii)  by inviting speakers to speak on
 campus;
 (iii)  by using a device to amplify sound; or
 (iv)  by using drums or other percussive
 instruments;
 (C)  camping or erecting tents or other living
 accommodations on campus;
 (D)  wearing a mask, facial covering, disguise, or
 other means of concealing a person's identity while engaging in
 expressive activities on campus with the intent to:
 (i)  obstruct the enforcement of the
 institution's rules or the law by avoiding identification;
 (ii)  intimidate others; or
 (iii)  interfere with an institution
 employee's or a peace officer's lawful performance of a duty;
 (E)  lowering the institution's flag of the United
 States or of this state with the intent to raise the flag of another
 nation or a flag representing an organization or group of people;
 and
 (F)  engaging in expressive activities on campus
 between the hours of 10 p.m. and 8 a.m.;
 (3) [(2)]  establish disciplinary sanctions for
 students, student organizations, or employees [faculty] who unduly
 interfere with the expressive activities of others on campus or
 violate an institution policy or state law;
 (4) [(3)]  include a grievance procedure for
 addressing complaints of a violation of this section;
 (5)  require students enrolled at or employees of the
 institution to present proof of identity and status at the
 institution on request by a peace officer on the institution's
 campus engaging in an official duty;
 (6) [(4)]  be approved by a majority vote of the
 institution's governing board before final adoption; and
 (7) [(5)]  be posted on the institution's Internet
 website.
 (k)  Nothing in this section limits the authority of an
 institution of higher education to adopt rules differentiating
 between the rights of students and employees to engage in
 expressive activities on campus and those of persons not affiliated
 with the institution.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.9315, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2025-2026 academic year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *