House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA6 Eckhardt | Journal Page: 1345 |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA6 Eckhardt | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Gutierrez | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA4 West | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Rereferred to committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |