Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |