Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |