House | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1039 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 101 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 101 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |