House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 688 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 102 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 102 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |