Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 102 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 102 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |