Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#942
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#811
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
2-Rosenthal
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Postponed
|
4/29/25 2:30 PM
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Rosenthal
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2391
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|