House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |