Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis November 20, 2024
Fiscal Note November 20, 2024
Bill November 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2025
Analysis March 28, 2025