E
|
04/24/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1443
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#368
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB1330
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1096
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 106
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|