House | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1638 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 526 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 482 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 468 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Miles | Journal Page: 467 |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 400 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 107 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 107 | |
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |