Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1402 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 11/15/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |