House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 King | Journal Page: 615 |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 542 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 109 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 109 | |
Senate | 11/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |