Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB388 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/19/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R3354 CXP-D
 By: King S.B. No. 388




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the legislature's goals for electric generation
 capacity in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.9044, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 39.9044.  GOAL FOR DISPATCHABLE GENERATION [NATURAL
 GAS]. (a) It is the intent of the legislature that 50 percent of
 the megawatts of generating capacity installed in the ERCOT power
 region [this state] after January 1, 2026 [2000], be sourced from
 dispatchable generation [use natural gas]. [To the extent
 permitted by law, the commission shall establish a program to
 encourage utilities to comply with this section by using natural
 gas produced in this state as the preferential fuel. This section
 does not apply to generating capacity for renewable energy
 technologies.]
 (b)  The commission shall establish a dispatchable
 generation [natural gas energy] credits trading program. Any power
 generation company, municipally owned utility, or electric
 cooperative that does not satisfy the requirements of Subsection
 (a) by directly owning or purchasing rights to dispatchable
 generation capacity [using natural gas technologies] shall
 purchase sufficient dispatchable generation [natural gas energy]
 credits to satisfy the requirements of this section [by holding
 natural gas energy credits in lieu of capacity from natural gas
 energy technologies].
 (c)  The [Not later than January 1, 2000, the] commission
 shall adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce this section
 [and to perform any necessary studies in cooperation with the
 Railroad Commission of Texas]. At a minimum, the rules must
 [shall]:
 (1)  describe how the commission will calculate
 [establish] the [minimum] annual dispatchable [natural gas]
 generation requirement for each power generation company,
 municipally owned utility, and electric cooperative operating in
 the ERCOT power region [this state] in a manner reasonably
 calculated by the commission to produce[, on a statewide basis,]
 compliance with the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  specify reasonable performance standards that all
 dispatchable generation [natural gas] capacity additions must meet
 to count against the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) and
 that:
 (A)  are designed and implemented [operated] so as
 to maximize reliability [the energy output from the capacity
 additions in accordance with then-current industry standards and
 best industry standards]; and
 (B)  encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new natural gas energy projects at those sites in the
 ERCOT power region [this state] that have the greatest economic
 potential for capture and development of this state's
 environmentally beneficial natural gas resources.
 (d)  On or before January 1, 2027, the commission shall
 activate the dispatchable generation credits trading program
 established by this section if the commission determines that
 dispatchable generation may provide less than 55 percent of all new
 generating capacity installed in the ERCOT power region after
 January 1, 2026. Not later than the 180th day after the date of the
 program's activation, the commission by rule shall determine the
 conditions for compliance and penalties for noncompliance for each
 power generation company, municipally owned utility, and electric
 cooperative subject to the program. The commission may adopt rules
 providing for alternative compliance payments [The commission,
 with the assistance of the Railroad Commission of Texas, shall
 adopt rules allowing and encouraging retail electric providers and
 municipally owned utilities and electric cooperatives that have
 adopted customer choice to market electricity generated using
 natural gas produced in this state as environmentally beneficial.
 The rules shall allow a provider, municipally owned utility, or
 cooperative to:
 [(1) emphasize that natural gas produced in this state
 is the cleanest-burning fossil fuel; and
 [(2) label the electricity generated using natural gas
 produced in this state as "green" electricity].
 (e)  In this section, "dispatchable generation" ["natural
 gas technology"] means generating technologies other than
 technologies considered non-dispatchable under Section 39.159(a)
 [any technology that exclusively relies on natural gas as a primary
 fuel source].
 (f)  The independent organization certified under Section
 39.151 for the ERCOT power region shall establish a tracking system
 to award dispatchable generation credits to new dispatchable
 generation facilities that meet eligibility requirements
 established by the commission. Each megawatt of installed
 dispatchable generation capacity energized after January 1, 2026,
 is eligible for one dispatchable generation credit.
 (g)  Not later than September 15 of each year, the
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151 for the
 ERCOT power region shall file with the commission a report on all
 generating facilities energized in the ERCOT power region during
 the prior year that includes a calculation of whether the prior
 year's installed dispatchable generation capacity is in compliance
 with this section.
 (h)  Not later than January 15 of each year, the commission
 shall notify each power generation company, municipally owned
 utility, and electric cooperative of the power generation
 company's, municipally owned utility's, or electric cooperative's
 dispatchable generation credits requirement for the prior year, if
 any.
 (i)  Each power generation company, municipally owned
 utility, or electric cooperative shall retire sufficient
 dispatchable generation credits to meet the power generation
 company's, municipally owned utility's, or electric cooperative's
 dispatchable generation credits requirement not later than an
 annual deadline established by the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 40.004, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 40.004.  JURISDICTION OF COMMISSION. Except as
 specifically otherwise provided in this chapter, the commission has
 jurisdiction over municipally owned utilities only for the
 following purposes:
 (1)  to regulate wholesale transmission rates and
 service, including terms of access, to the extent provided by
 Subchapter A, Chapter 35;
 (2)  to regulate certification of retail service areas
 to the extent provided by Chapter 37;
 (3)  to regulate rates on appeal under Subchapters D
 and E, Chapter 33, subject to Section 40.051(c);
 (4)  to establish a code of conduct as provided by
 Section 39.157(e) applicable to anticompetitive activities and to
 affiliate activities limited to structurally unbundled affiliates
 of municipally owned utilities, subject to Section 40.054;
 (5)  to establish terms and conditions for open access
 to transmission and distribution facilities for municipally owned
 utilities providing customer choice, as provided by Section 39.203;
 (6)  to administer the dispatchable generation
 [natural gas energy] credits program under Section 39.9044(b);
 (7)  to require reports of municipally owned utility
 operations only to the extent necessary to:
 (A)  enable the commission to determine the
 aggregate load and energy requirements of the state and the
 resources available to serve that load; or
 (B)  enable the commission to determine
 information relating to market power as provided by Section 39.155;
 and
 (8)  to evaluate and monitor the cybersecurity
 preparedness of a municipally owned utility described by Section
 39.1516(a)(3) or (4).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.