Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2024
Analysis November 21, 2024
Fiscal Note November 21, 2024

Engrossed

Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 23, 2025
Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2025
Fiscal Note April 17, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025