House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1586 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 938 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 65 | |
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |