Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |