Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB455 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2024
Analysis November 21, 2024
Fiscal Note November 21, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis May 1, 2025
Bill May 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 31, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2025
Analysis March 28, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 27, 2025
Fiscal Note March 3, 2025