Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2024
Analysis November 21, 2024
Fiscal Note November 21, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2025
Fiscal Note March 11, 2025