House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |