House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 671 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 673 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 671 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |