Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |