Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2024
Fiscal Note December 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 4, 2025