House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 669 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 668 |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |