E | 04/24/2025 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1505 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1410 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Record vote | RV#302 | Journal Page: 1572 |
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Additional sponsor(s) authorized | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2196 | Journal Page: 1530 |
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1532 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 516 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 516 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |