Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |