Senate | 04/09/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |