Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1372
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote RV#1372
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1364
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Record vote RV#1364
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Virdell and Harris Davila
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Amended 2-Virdell
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Postponed
|
5/2/25 1:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Postponed 5/2/25 1:15 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Virdell and Harris Davila
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Virdell
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1618
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 329
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 131
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 131
|
Senate
|
12/13/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2024
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|