House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 728 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |