House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |