Senate | 05/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |