Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB629 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+89R5761 KRM-D
12 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 629
2- (In the Senate - Filed December 17, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
4- April 30, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 1; April 30, 2025,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 629 By: Hughes
93
104
115
126
137 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
148 AN ACT
159 relating to the accrual of interest on overdue child support.
1610 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
17- SECTION 1. Section 157.265, Family Code, is amended to read
18- as follows:
19- Sec. 157.265. ACCRUAL OF INTEREST ON CHILD SUPPORT. (a)
20- Interest accrues on the portion of delinquent child support that is
21- greater than the amount of the monthly periodic support obligation
22- at the rate of three [six] percent simple interest per year from the
23- date the support is delinquent until the date the support is paid or
24- the arrearages are confirmed and reduced to money judgment.
11+ SECTION 1. Sections 157.265(a), (b), and (c), Family Code,
12+ are amended to read as follows:
13+ (a) Interest accrues on the portion of delinquent child
14+ support that is greater than the amount of the monthly periodic
15+ support obligation at the rate of three [six] percent simple
16+ interest per year from the date the support is delinquent until the
17+ date the support is paid or the arrearages are confirmed and reduced
18+ to money judgment.
2519 (b) Interest accrues on child support arrearages that have
2620 been confirmed and reduced to money judgment as provided in this
2721 subchapter at the rate of three [six] percent simple interest per
2822 year from the date the order is rendered until the date the judgment
2923 is paid.
3024 (c) Interest accrues on a money judgment for retroactive or
3125 lump-sum child support at the annual rate of three [six] percent
3226 simple interest from the date the order is rendered until the
3327 judgment is paid.
34- (d) Subsection (a) applies to a child support payment that
35- becomes due on or after January 1, 2026 [2002].
36- (e) Child support arrearages in existence on January 1, 2026
37- [2002], that were not confirmed and reduced to a money judgment on
38- or before that date accrue interest as follows:
39- (1) before January 1, 2026 [2002], the arrearages are
40- subject to the interest rate that applied to the arrearages before
41- that date; and
42- (2) on and after January 1, 2026 [2002], the
43- cumulative total of arrearages and interest accumulated on those
44- arrearages described by Subdivision (1) is subject to Subsection
45- (a).
46- (f) Subsections (b) and (c) apply to a money judgment for
47- child support rendered on or after January 1, 2026 [2002]. A money
48- judgment for child support rendered before that date is governed by
49- the law in effect on the date the judgment was rendered, and the
50- former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
51- SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
52- * * * * *
28+ SECTION 2. Sections 157.265(d), (e), and (f), Family Code,
29+ are repealed.
30+ SECTION 3. (a) Section 157.265(a), Family Code, as amended
31+ by this Act, applies to a child support payment that becomes due on
32+ or after January 1, 2026.
33+ (b) Child support arrearages in existence on January 1,
34+ 2026, that were not confirmed and reduced to a money judgment on or
35+ before that date accrue interest as follows:
36+ (1) before January 1, 2002, the arrearages are subject
37+ to the interest rate that applied to the arrearages before that
38+ date;
39+ (2) on or after January 1, 2002, but before January 1,
40+ 2026, the arrearages are subject to the interest rate that applied
41+ to the arrearages immediately before the effective date of this
42+ Act; and
43+ (3) on or after January 1, 2026, the cumulative total
44+ of arrearages and interest accumulated on the arrearages described
45+ by Subdivisions (1) and (2) of this subsection is subject to Section
46+ 157.265(a), Family Code, as amended by this Act.
47+ (c) Sections 157.265(b) and (c), Family Code, as amended by
48+ this Act, apply only to a money judgment for child support rendered
49+ on or after January 1, 2026. A money judgment rendered before that
50+ date is governed by the law in effect on the date the judgment was
51+ rendered, and the former law is continued in effect for that
52+ purpose.
53+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.