Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB650 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: West, et al. S.B. No. 650
2-
3-
1+By: West S.B. No. 650
2+ (In the Senate - Filed December 18, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
4+ March 18, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 18, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 650 By: Hughes
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to requiring the use of electronically readable
914 information to verify a purchaser's age in the retail sale of
1015 alcoholic beverages.
1116 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
12- SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Deshawn Jagwan
13- Act.
14- SECTION 2. Section 109.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
15- amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), and (d-1) and
16- amending Subsections (b) and (d) to read as follows:
17- (a-1) A person shall visually inspect and access
18- electronically readable information on a driver's license,
19- commercial driver's license, or identification certificate for the
20- purpose of verifying a purchaser's age in any retail sale of an
21- alcoholic beverage. A person required to access electronically
22- readable information under this subsection may manually enter into
23- an electronic reader the information on the driver's license,
24- commercial driver's license, or identification certificate if the
25- license or certificate cannot be electronically scanned. This
26- subsection does not apply to the holder of a food and beverage
27- certificate operating a restaurant on the premises.
28- (a-2) The commission may not take any disciplinary action
29- against the holder of a permit or license issued under this code for
30- a violation of Subsection (a-1) if:
31- (1) the license or permit holder's failure to access
32- the electronically readable information is a result of a disruption
33- of, interruption of, or inability to access Internet connectivity
34- services or data connectivity services; and
35- (2) the license or permit holder visually inspected
36- the purchaser's driver's license, commercial driver's license, or
37- identification certificate to verify the purchaser's age.
38- (a-3) The commission shall not take any disciplinary action
17+ SECTION 1. Section 109.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
18+ amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
19+ (a-1) A person shall access electronically readable
20+ information on a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or
21+ identification certificate for the purpose of verifying a
22+ purchaser's age in any retail sale of an alcoholic beverage. This
23+ subsection does not apply to the retail sale of an alcoholic
24+ beverage on the premises of the holder of a package store permit.
25+ (a-2) The commission shall not take any disciplinary action
3926 against the holder of a permit or license issued under this code for
4027 a violation of Subsection (a-1) for the retail sale of an alcoholic
4128 beverage made before September 1, 2027. This subsection expires
4229 September 1, 2028.
43- (b) A person may not retain information accessed under this
44- section [unless the commission by rule requires the information to
45- be retained. The person may not retain the information longer than
46- the commission requires].
47- (d) Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), a [A] person who
48- violates this section commits an offense. An offense under this
49- section is a Class A misdemeanor.
50- (d-1) It is a defense to prosecution for failure to access
51- electronically readable information on a driver's license,
52- commercial driver's license, or identification certificate as
53- required by Subsection (a-1) that:
54- (1) the person's failure to access the electronically
55- readable information as required by Subsection (a-1) was caused by
56- a disruption of, interruption of, or inability to access Internet
57- connectivity services or data connectivity services that prevented
58- the person from accessing the information; or
59- (2) the purchaser was 40 years of age or older on the
60- date of the purchase.
61- SECTION 3. Not later than September 1, 2027, the Texas
30+ SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2027, the Texas
6231 Alcoholic Beverage Commission shall adopt rules to implement
6332 Section 109.61(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as added by this Act.
64- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
33+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
34+ * * * * *